PATIENT PARTICIPATION GROUP OF BURBAGE SURGERY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
By working with the doctors at the surgery, we aim to provide a voice for local patients to ensure the priorities of the surgery match the aspirations and needs of those patients. Fundraising activities e.g. Coffe Mornings, Fashion shows and Golf Days enable the group to provide support services and equipment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 08 September 2008: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Pascal Goes Mr | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Coates | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Donna Gilbert Mrs | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr PHILIP CHRISTOPHER THOMASON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.53k | £1.37k | £1.03k | £1.07k | £1.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.41k | £1.07k | £1.13k | £817 | £470 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 NOVEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
A) TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF THE BURBAGE SURGERY MEDICAL PRACTICE BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, SUPPORT SERVICES AND EQUIPMENT NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES. B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN HEALTH CARE BY THE PROVISION OF LECTURES, FORA AND BY THE PUBLICATION OF A MONTHLY NEWSLETTER DEVOTED TO THE PROMOTION OF HEALTHCARE FOR THE LOCAL RESIDENTS OF BURBAGE AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
BURBAGE SURGERY
TILTON ROAD
BURBAGE
HINCKLEY
LE10 2SE
- Phone:
- 08444771883
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window