SHAHJALAL CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Daily Muslim Congregational Prayers. Weekday Supplementary Classes for children between 5-7pm. Social Events to Strengthen Community Relations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £10,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 28 March 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LONI MIAH | Trustee | 02 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
NADIR RAHMAN | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|||||
FARUK AHMED | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.70k | £50.50k | £55.97k | £80.98k | £90.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.57k | £33.63k | £20.48k | £28.84k | £31.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.00k | N/A | N/A | £10.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 April 2025 | 67 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 April 2025 | 67 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 September 2024 | 218 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 September 2024 | 218 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 March 2022 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 March 2022 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 December 2021 | 327 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 December 2021 | 327 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 NOVEMBER 2005, AS AMENDED 9 MARCH 2008
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE AND PROVIDE DAILY CONGREGATIONAL PRAYER FACILITY FOR THE SERVICE USERS. B) TO PROMOTE, ORGANISE AND TEACH SUPPLEMENTARY LANGUAGE CLASSES AND MAINSTREAM SUBJECTS TO THE RESIDENTS AND USERS OF THE CENTRE. C) PROVIDE ADVICE AND COUNSELLING FACILITIES FOR THE SERVICE USERS AND RESIDENTS LIVING IN THE NEIGHBOURHOODS ON ISSUES RANGING FROM MORAL DILEMMAS TO HEALTH ISSUES. D) ESTABLISH A CENTRE OF EDUCATION AN KNOWLEDGE. WILL PROVIDE ACCESS TO TECHNOLOGICAL RESOURCES AND A LIBRARY OF KNOWLEDGE AND EDUCATION FOR ITS USERS AND RESIDENTS. E) PROVIDE AND PROMOTE SERVICES FOR THE FEMALE RESIDENTS OF THE LOCALITY. THE CENTRE WILL CATER ON DIFFERENT ACTIVITIES AND FACILITIES FOR THE FEMALE USERS/COMMUNITY OF THE LOCALITY. F) TO UNITE THE COMMUNITY IN ORDER TO INSPIRE THEM TO DEVOTE THEMSELVES WHOLE-HEARTEDLY TO THE SERVICES OF THE COMMUNITY. G) ORGANISE SOCIAL EVENTS TO STRENGTHEN THE COMMUNITY RELATIONS. H) PROVIDE AND FOSTER GOODWILL AND FRIENDLY RELATION WITH THE LOCAL, OUTER COMMUNITY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS. I) TO SUPPORT RELIGIOUS, EDUCATIONAL AND RECREATIONAL INTEREST OF THE PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA. J) PROMOTE EQUAL OPPORTUNITY AND HARMONIOUS RELATIONS IN THE SOCIETY AND TO OPPOSE ALL ATTEMPTS TO DIVIDE THE COMMUNITY IN ANY SORT OF DISORDER SUCH AS ANTI SOCIAL BEHAVIOUR. K) PROVIDE AN OPPORTUNITY FOR EXCHANGE OF CULTURE BETWEEN THE DIFFERENT FACTIONS OF RESIDENTS/USERS OF THE CENTRE. L) PROVIDE ACTIVITIES THROUGH OUT THE YEAR FOR GENERAL USERS/RESIDENTS (I.E. CONFERENCES, OPEN DAYS ETC) IN ORDER TO INTEGRATE THE COMMUNITY. M) ESTABLISH EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR POSTS IN CONJUNCTION TO THE ACTIVITIES AND SERVICES PROVIDED. N) IT WILL FOLLOW THE CHARITY RULES AND REGULATION OF UK. O) ABIDE BY THE POLITICAL BY-LAWS OF UK
Area of benefit
LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Shahjalal Centre
25 Hale Street
Poplar
London
E14 0BF
- Phone:
- 02030921752
- Email:
- poplarshahjalal@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window