Leo Lion Foundation

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The COINS Foundation is unable to make awards to unsolicited applicants. Please do not apply for a grant unless you have been invited to do so. The Foundation works in partnership with excluded and disenfranchised people to develop inclusive communities especially in the developing world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£3,279,251
Donations and legacies | £2.88m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £110.05k | |
Investments | £68.07k | |
Other | £219.39k |
Total expenditure:
£1,169,780
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £904.74k | |
Other | £265.04k |
£219,394 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £265.04k | |
Charitable expenditure | £904.74k | |
Retained for future use | £2.11m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £265.04k | |
Charitable expenditure | £904.74k | |
Retained for future use | £2.33m |
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Slough
- Throughout London
- Ethiopia
- Haiti
- Kenya
- Mozambique
- Nepal
- Rwanda
- Tanzania
- The Gambia
- Uganda
- United States
- Zambia
Governance
- 02 January 2008: Standard registration
- 09 September 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 19 October 2010: Standard registration
- COINS FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ClaireFelicia Cookson | Trustee | 27 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jake Hatt | Trustee | 12 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Brown | Trustee | 29 August 2017 |
|
|||||
Joanne PICKFORD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LARRY SULLIVAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £445.18k | £213.04k | £931.13k | £3.03m | £3.28m | |
|
Total expenditure | £428.36k | £369.29k | £408.07k | £1.33m | £1.17m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £930.92k | £2.85m | £2.88m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £125.57k | £110.05k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £209 | £61.93k | £68.07k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £219.39k | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £374.73k | £1.08m | £904.74k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £33.34k | £35.72k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £13.96k | £22.33k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £352.37k | £868.01k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £218.49k | £265.04k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | £516.83k | £541.34k | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | £70.17k | £243.42k | £3.29m | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | £725.50k | £2.74m | £2.08m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | £5.39k | £433.61k | £166.22k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 March 2021 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 March 2021 | 30 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12 NOVEMBER 2007 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 17 FEB 2020 as amended on 13 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, (1) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF HOUSING, EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS, ITEMS SERVICES OR FACILITIES, AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT. (2) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED AND SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTER IN THE FORM OF GRANTS OF MONEY FOR PERSONS, BODIES, ORGANISATIONS. (3) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, EQUIPMENT AND OTHER ITEMS AND SERVICES CONNECTED WITH THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION. (4) TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND OTHER ITEMS OR SERVICES FOR HEALTHY RECREATION. (5) TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THE ABOVE, “SOCIALLY EXCLUDED” MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS; CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY).”
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
1A Royal Parade
Tilford Road
HINDHEAD
Surrey
GU26 6TD
- Phone:
- 07802349596
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window