CENTRE INTERNATIONAL ENVANGELIQUE POUR DES LEADERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Objectives and activities The principal object of the ministry is the advancement of the Evangelical christian faith worlwide in accordance with the doctrines set in the statement of faith contained in the object. The organisation also carry out other charitable purpose in he United Kindom and accross the world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
People

2 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Haringey
Governance
- 05 December 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tanyia Bahindwa-Bokota | Trustee | 29 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
PATRICE DESIRE YAPI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.95k | £21.37k | £9.87k | £19.19k | £19.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.00k | £20.97k | £4.08k | £17.69k | £17.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 553 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 553 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 918 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 918 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 March 2022 | 151 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 February 2021 | 113 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10 OCTOBER 2007
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EVANGELICAL CHRISTIAN FAITH WORLD-WIDE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES SET OUT IN THE STATEMENT OF FAITH CONTAINED IN THE SCHEDULE (THE "OBJECT") TRUSTEES MUST USE THE INCOME AND MAY USE THE CAPITAL OF THE TRUST IN PROMOTING THE OBJECT.
Area of benefit
WORLD-WIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 ONTARIO CLOSE
BROXBOURNE
EN10 6FQ
- Phone:
- 01992466486
- Email:
- info@cielsurterre.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window