JUBILEE FAMILY CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Based in Aylsham, Norfolk, the Jubilee Family Centre cares, supports & provides activities for families, couples, singles & groups. At the heart of the Centre's identity is the need to create and support a vibrant and healthy community life for Aylsham & its surrounding villages. We want everyone to know that they are valued, cared for and included.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Norfolk
Governance
- 23 January 2008: Standard registration
- 11 September 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
- 11 September 2024: Funds transferred to 1105216 AYLSHAM COMMUNITY CHURCH
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 30/06/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.48k | £26.29k | £29.80k | £13.60k | £3.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.98k | £31.74k | £32.90k | £27.25k | £25.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 26 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 August 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 SEPTEMBER 2007, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 13 JANUARY 2008
Charitable objects
3.1) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF AYLSHAM, NORFOLK AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (THE AREA OF BENEFIT) THE PROVISION OR THE ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. 3.2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT BY EDUCATING AND TRAINING IN BASIC SKILLS, MARRIAGE AND PARENTING SKILLS, PERSONAL FINANCIAL MANAGEMENT AND THE PROVISION OF AFTER SCHOOL AND HOLIDAY CLUBS. 3.3) TO RELIEVE PERSONS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, ASSISTANCE AND PRACTICAL SUPPORT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NORFOLK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window