Accounts and annual returns BRIGHTON MOSQUE & MUSLIM COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1122974
Regulatory alert
Charity reporting is up to date (19 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 October 2023 18 September 2024 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2023

(These accounts
have been qualified)

18 September 2024 19 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 October 2022 28 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2022 04 August 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2021 12 March 2022 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 12 March 2022 12 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 29 March 2021 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 29 March 2021 29 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2019 06 March 2020 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 06 March 2020 6 days late Download Open in new window