Financial history BRIGHTON MOSQUE & MUSLIM COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1122974
Regulatory alert
Charity reporting is up to date (19 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/10/2022 30/10/2023
Total gross income £62.71k £55.14k £55.14k £84.66k £44.18k
Total expenditure £68.10k £44.03k £44.03k £78.04k £103.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A