VOLUNTARY ACTION BROXTOWE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community development to tackle disadvantage. Services & volunteer opportunities, with social care support: First Steps:people with learning disability/physical disabilities/long term conditions Caring Companions/Live Wires:befriending for older people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2020
Total income includes £19,979 from 3 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 18 December 2007: Standard registration
- 31 August 2021: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 31 August 2021: Funds transferred to 1160885 BEESTON COMMUNITY RESOURCE CIO
- 31 August 2021: Funds transferred to 1125946 BROXTOWE WOMEN'S PROJECT LIMITED
- 31 August 2021: Funds transferred to 1155914 CANALSIDE HERITAGE CENTRE
- 31 August 2021: Funds transferred to 1091495 EASTWOOD VOLUNTEER BUREAU AND FOOD BANK
- 31 August 2021: Funds transferred to 1079880 RUSHCLIFFE COMMUNITY AND VOLUNTARY SERVICE
- 31 August 2021: Funds transferred to 1085498 THE HELPFUL BUREAU
- VOLUNTEER CENTRE BROXTOWE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 30/09/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £240.44k | £190.99k | £208.07k | £81.57k | £88.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £216.69k | £215.91k | £182.19k | £121.91k | £142.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £8.08k | £6.67k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £8.19k | £0 | £48.40k | £8.69k | £19.98k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 31 July 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 31 July 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 04 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 04 January 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 25 September 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 25 September 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 FEBRUARY 2007 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 5 JANUARY 2010
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF BROXTOWE AND ITS ENVIRONS ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE INHABITANTS, LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF LIFE OF SAID INHABITANTS AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY TO: (A) ADVANCE THE EDUCATION, LEARNING AND SKILLS OF VOLUNTEERS, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF TRAINING, ADVICE, ASSISTANCE AND ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES SO THAT THEY ARE BETTER EQUIPPED TO CARRY OUT THEIR ROLE AND PROVIDE A VALUABLE CONTRIBUTION TO THEIR COMMUNITY; (B) PROMOTE THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR AND VOLUNTEERING GENERALLY AND TO UNDERTAKE VOLUNTARY WORK, THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, LEARNING AND SKILLS AND SERVICES FOR THE SOCIAL BENEFIT OF THE LOCAL COMMUNITY AND SIMILAR CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES, AND TO ENHANCE THOSE SERVICES PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY SECTOR.
Area of benefit
BROXTOWE AND ITS ENVIRONS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window