Financial history THE CHARTERED INSTITUTE OF EDUCATIONAL ASSESSORS

Charity number: 1122014
Charity reporting is up to date (4 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £100.60k £172.73k £148.14k £93.34k £79.11k
Total expenditure £109.63k £178.59k £147.47k £91.79k £84.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A