Trustees THE CHARTERED INSTITUTE OF EDUCATIONAL ASSESSORS

Charity number: 1122014
Charity reporting is up to date (4 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sharon Ward Trustee 20 April 2023
None on record
Dame Kathryn August Trustee 20 April 2023
None on record
Ian Gunn Trustee 01 October 2021
None on record
Neil King Trustee 01 October 2021
None on record
Dr David Jenkins-Handy Trustee 01 October 2021
None on record
Tim Sherriff Trustee 01 October 2018
None on record
Carolyn Thomas-Coxhead Trustee 20 July 2017
None on record
Dr JOANNA GOODMAN Trustee 01 October 2016
None on record