HOSPICE SERVICES AT HOME TLC
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of Specialist End of Life Care in the following areas 1) Complementary Therapies. 2) Emergancy Palliative Nursing Care. 3) Respite for Carers 4) Enhanced Personal Hygiene Services 5) Bereavement Counselling Service 6) 24 hour Message Service (Non Medical)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
- Surrey
- West Sussex
Governance
- 03 April 2008: Standard registration
- 03 March 2011: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 03 March 2011: Funds transferred to 1136093 HOSPICE SERVICES AT HOME TLC LIMITED
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 17 September 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17 MARCH 2008.
Charitable objects
1) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS BY PROVIDING PALLIATIVE CARE AND, IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECT BUT NOT OTHERWISE TO PROVIDE: A) COUNSELLING B) A TELEPHONE HELPLINE C) A RESPITE SERVICE D) COMPLEMENTARY THERAPIES IN PALLIATIVE NURSING CARE; AND E) PERSONAL HYGIENE SERVICES 2) THE RELIEF OF SUFFERING AND DISTRESS CAUSED BY BEREAVEMENT, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING; 3) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THERAPISTS WHO PROVIDE PALLIATIVE CARE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY FACILITATING ACCESS TO VOCATIONAL TRAINING COURSES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE HAMPSHIRE, SURREY, WEST SUSSEX, DORSET AND SOMERSET.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window