Financial history HEMEL HEMPSTEAD TOWN YOUTH FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity number: 1124752
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £78.54k £73.78k £110.31k £161.32k £171.77k
Total expenditure £56.79k £83.39k £108.92k £185.46k £142.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A