GRAHAMSTOWN UNITED SCHOOLS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide bursaries to academically outstanding pupils or those pupils deserving and in need of financial assistance; To assist with the provision of, the maintenance of, the repair of, the upgrading of, or the improvement of classrooms, educational, sporting and other facilities and equipment; For such other purposes as the trustees may in their discretion consider beneficial
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- South Africa
Governance
- 29 January 2008: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW JOHN ESSEX LA TROBE | Chair |
|
||||||||||
Russell Clough | Trustee | 06 February 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
BRIAN VINCENT WAKEHAM | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
GRAHAM JOHN BIRD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.07k | £15.41k | £22.38k | £20.95k | £61.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £68.89k | £29.26k | £22.38k | £0 | £21.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 November 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 29 NOVEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
3.1 THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME, AN ALL OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL, AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER TO, OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS (THE "OBJECTS"), AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT; 3.1.1 TO FURTHER THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS ATTENDING ANY ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING GRAHAMSTOWN SCHOOLS:- A) ST ANDREWS PREPARATORY SCHOOL; B) THE DIOCESAN SCHOOL FOR GIRLS; C) ST ANDREWS COLLEGE (TOGETHER THE "GRAHAMSTOWN SCHOOLS") 3.1.2 TO PROVIDE BURSARIES TO ACADEMICALLY OUTSTANDING PUPILS OR THOSE PUPILS DESERVING AND IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION DETERMINE, TO ASSIST THEM OR ENABLE THEM TO ATTEND ANY ONE OR MORE OF THE GRAHAMSTOWN SCHOOLS; 3.2.3 TO ASSIST WITH THE PROVISION OF, THE MAINTENANCE OF, THE REPAIR OF, THE UPGRADING OF, OR THE IMPROVEMENT OF CLASSROOMS, EDUCATIONAL, SPORTING AND OTHER FACILITIES AND EQUIPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF ANY ONE OR MORE OF THE GRAHAMSTOWN SCHOOLS AND/OR THEIR PUPILS; 3.1.4 FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION CONSIDER BENEFICIAL TO ANY ONE OR MORE OF THE GRAHAMSTOWN SCHOOLS OR ANY ONE OR MORE OF THE PUPILS ATTENDING THE GRAHAMSTOWN SCHOOLS. 3.2 THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION, FOR THE PERIOD OF 21 YEARS FROM THE DATE OF THIS DEED, INSTEAD OF APPLYING THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN ANY YEAR, ACCUMULATE ALL OR ANY PART OF SUCH INCOME BY INVESTING THE SAME, AND THE RESULTING INCOME, IN ANY INVESTMENTS AUTHORISED BY THIS DEED OR BY LAW AS AN ACCRETION TO AND AS PART OF THE CAPITAL OF THE CHARITY, WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THEIR RIGHT TO APPLY THE WHOLE OR ANY PART OF SUCH ACCUMULATED INCOME IN ANY SUBSEQUENT YEAR AS IF THE SAME WERE INCOME OF THE CHARITY ARISING IN THE THEN CURRENT YEAR.
Area of benefit
AFRICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 Naylor Road
Whetstone
N20 0HN
- Phone:
- 07767873015
- Email:
- bvw20nlr@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window