THANDA UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Thanda is a community-based organisation in South Africa that runs four programmes: Early Childhood Development, After-school, Organic Farming, and Creative Learning Training. Thanda provides educational and skills-building opportunities for children, youth, and adults in rural areas developing five game-changing skills: self-esteem, perspective, empathy, critical thinking, and creativity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- South Africa
Governance
- 09 October 2008: Standard registration
- TANDA UK (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN LEE HOWARD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW MELLGARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KEVIN BRYANT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.08k | £89.10k | £39.73k | £27.13k | £33.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.61k | £11.65k | £29.87k | £12.15k | £4.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 25 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 25 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 30 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 30 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 30 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 30 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 20 AUGUST 2008
Charitable objects
TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO AGE 21 YEARS LIVING IN SOUTH AFRICA THROUGH ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY. TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 21 YEARS LIVING IN SOUTH AFRICA BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF A, ADVANCING THEIR EDUCATION; AND B, PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTEREST OF THEIR SOCIAL WELFARE WHERE THEY HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
SOUTH AFRICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 6
15 Broad Court
London
WC2B 5QN
- Phone:
- 00
- Email:
- info@thanda.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window