Trustees DORSET COMMUNITY FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1122113

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michelle Howard | Trustee | 07 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Neil Lewis | Trustee | 07 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Martha Searle | Trustee | 24 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jenifer Anne Richardson | Trustee | 24 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Rebecca Stalker | Trustee | 09 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lee Hardy | Trustee | 09 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nick Lee | Trustee | 17 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Louise Hazel Coulton | Trustee | 14 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Terry Standing | Trustee | 14 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Appleby | Trustee | 14 December 2020 |
|
|||||
Tom Nicholas Flood | Trustee | 14 December 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.