Accounts and annual returns LYE AMATEUR BODYBUILDING

Charity number: 1122558
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 27 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2023 21 June 2024 82 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2022 29 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 29 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 12 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required