Accounts and annual returns Emirates Foundation UK

Charity number: 1125008
Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 26 March 2024 55 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 02 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 July 2022 174 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 July 2021 156 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required