Emirates Foundation UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We at The Emirates Foundation UK believe that every life matters regardless of ethnic background, nationality, age, religious beliefs, disabilities, immigration status, etc Our purpose is to help remedy global humanitarian community issues & disaster relief. Our main core area of expertise is to provide various assistance packages of up to £750,000 to other bodies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Abu Dhabi
- Afghanistan
- Ajman
- Albania
- Algeria
- Angola
- Anguilla
- Antigua And Barbuda
- Argentina
- Azerbaijan
- Bahrain
- Bangladesh
- Barbados
- Belarus
- Belgium
- Bhutan
- Bolivia
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Botswana
- Brazil
- British Indian Ocean Territory
- Brunei
- Bulgaria
- Burkina Faso
- Burma
- Cambodia
- Cameroon
- Central African Republic
- Chad
- Chile
- China
- Congo
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Costa Rica
- Cuba
- Czech Republic
- Djibouti
- Dominican Republic
- Dubai
- East Timor
- Ecuador
- Egypt
- El Salvador
- Equatorial Guinea
- Eritrea
- Ethiopia
- Fiji
- France
- French Guiana
- French Polynesia
- French Southern Territories
- Fujairah
- Ghana
- Greece
- Guam
- Guatemala
- Guernsey
- Guinea
- Guinea-bissau
- Guyana
- Haiti
- Honduras
- Hong Kong
- India
- Indonesia
- Iran
- Iraq
- Ireland
- Isle Of Man
- Ivory Coast
- Jamaica
- Jordan
- Kazakhstan
- Kenya
- Kiribati
- Kosovo
- Kuwait
- Kyrgyzstan
- Laos
- Lebanon
- Liberia
- Libya
- Madagascar
- Malawi
- Malaysia
- Mali
- Mauritania
- Mauritius
- Mexico
- Mongolia
- Montserrat
- Morocco
- Mozambique
- Namibia
- Nepal
- Netherlands
- Nicaragua
- Niger
- Nigeria
- Northern Ireland
- North Korea
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
- Oman
- Pakistan
- Panama
- Papua New Guinea
- Paraguay
- Peru
- Philippines
- Puerto Rico
- Qatar
- Ras Al-khaimah
- Réunion
- Romania
- Russia
- Rwanda
- Saudi Arabia
- Scotland
- Senegal
- Serbia
- Seychelles
- Sierra Leone
- Singapore
- Somalia
- South Africa
- South Korea
- South Sudan
- Sri Lanka
- Sudan
- Suriname
- Switzerland
- Syria
- Taiwan
- Tajikistan
- Tanzania
- Thailand
- The Gambia
- Togo
- Tonga
- Trinidad And Tobago
- Tunisia
- Turkey
- Turkmenistan
- Turks And Caicos Islands
- Tuvalu
- Uganda
- Umm Al-quwain
- United Arab Emirates
- United States
- Uruguay
- Uzbekistan
- Venezuela
- Western Sahara
- Yemen
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 16 July 2008: Standard registration
- LEICESTERSHIRE ETHNIC MINORITY PARTNERSHIP LTD (Previous name)
- The Ayat Charitable Foundation (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
His Excellency Ambassador Ismail Patel | Chair | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £297 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 110 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 110 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 March 2024 | 55 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 July 2022 | 174 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 July 2021 | 156 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 NOVEMBER 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 5 JUNE 2008 as amended on 09 Aug 2022 as amended on 25 Mar 2024
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR IN LEICESTER, LEICESTERSHIRE AND RUTLAND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL AND PARTICULAR PEOPLE OF AFRICAN, AFRICAN-CARIBBEAN, ASIAN, CHINESE, POLISH AND OTHER MINORITY GROUPS, ESPECIALLY THOSE WHO ARE DISCRIMINATED AGAINST ON THE BASIS OF COLOUR, RACE OR NATIONALITY, BY MEANS OF; A) LIASING BETWEEN CHARITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS, GOVERNMENT AGENCIES AND OTHER GROUPS ON RELEVANT ISSUES INCLUDING THOSE THAT AFFECT MINORITY GROUPS. B) IDENTIFYING NEEDS IN THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR AND ESTABLISHING PROJECTS OR POLICIES TO ADDRESS THEM. C) GATHERING AND PROVIDING INFORMATION ON THE OPERATION OF THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR IN GENERAL AND MINORITY GROUPS IN PARTICULAR; D) ACTING AS A REPRESENTATIVE OF THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR ESPECIALLY ON BEHALF OF MEMBERS OF MINORITY GROUPS IN RELATION TO GOVERNMENT POLICIES AND LEGISLATION. THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR MEANS CHARITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS. CHARITIES ARE ORGANISATIONS WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES. VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS ARE INDEPENDENT ORGANISATIONS WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR PURPOSES THAT ADD VALUE TO THE COMITY AS A WHOLE, OR A SIGNIFICANT SECTION OF THE COMITY AND WHICH ARE NOT PERMITTED BY THEIR CONSTITUTIONS TO MAKE A PROFIT FOR PRIVATE DISTRIBUTION. VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS DO NOT INCLUDE LOCAL GOVERNMENT OR OTHER STATUTORY AUTHORITIES.
Area of benefit
LEICESTER, LEICESTERSHIRE AND RUTLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
Top Floor, 78 Granby Street
Leicester
Leicestershire
LE1 1DJ
- Phone:
- 07796711404
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window