Financial history THE CELLULAR SOLUTIONS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1122909
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £19.86k £15.33k £4 £6.83k £535
Total expenditure £25.46k £3.64k £20.65k £19.97k £7.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A