Financial history HARVEST HOUSE INTERNATIONAL CHURCH

Charity number: 1121894
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.25k £9.48k £9.85k £12.50k £11.98k
Total expenditure £6.90k £9.07k £9.65k £12.11k £11.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A