Financial history WOOTTON AND DRY SANDFORD COMMUNITY CENTRE LTD

Charity number: 1121899
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £83.82k £66.96k £92.78k £105.09k £105.09k
Total expenditure £83.31k £69.72k £94.87k £97.07k £97.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £28.07k £13.12k £6.04k £5.50k