Trustees WOOTTON AND DRY SANDFORD COMMUNITY CENTRE LTD
Charity number: 1121899

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Jane Foulks | Trustee | 26 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Gerald Richards | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gerardine Marie Marthe Quaghebeur | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Parker | Trustee | 04 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janet Scott | Trustee | 21 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sue Rayner | Trustee | 14 March 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.