KENWOOD DAIRY RESTORATION TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
planning restoration, consultations and logisitics of fund raising
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Camden
Governance
- 07 February 2008: Standard registration
- 25 April 2017: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 25 April 2017: Funds transferred to 273258 THE FRIENDS OF THE IVEAGH BEQUEST, KENWOOD
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2012 | 30/09/2013 | 30/09/2014 | 30/09/2015 | 30/09/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.60k | £13.76k | £6.73k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £400 | £25.25k | £20.75k | £1.46k | £5.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2016 | 05 April 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2015 | 04 July 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2014 | 14 February 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2013 | 22 May 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION 29 NOVEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
TO BENEFIT THE PUBLIC BY ASSISTING AND SUPPORTING SUCH BODIES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE RESPONSIBLE FOR THE RESTORATION, CONSERVATION, PRESERVATION, ENHANCEMENT AND PROTECTION OF KENWOOD DAIRY, PART OF THE IVEAGH BEQUEST, KENWOOD, TO ENABLE PUBLIC ACCESS TO THE DAIRY IN ORDER TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS RELATING TO THE HISTORY, CULTURE AND PRESENT DAY SIGNIFICANCE OF THE DAIRY.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE LONDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window