FOSCOLO APPEAL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To restore the tomb of Ugo Foscolo at the church of St. Nicholas with St. Marz Magdalene in the parish of Chiswick for the benefit of the Public and to promote wider cultural awareness of the poet and his works.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hounslow
Governance
- 19 April 2008: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROCCO FRANCO | Trustee |
|
||||||
ELISA PROVINI WALKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DEBORAH MARTINELLI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN MARK LINDON optional | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DENIS VINCENT REIDY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £40 | £40 | £40 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2025 | 365 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 12 May 2021 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 11 APRIL 208
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE LIFE AND WORK OF UGO FOSCOLO, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE RESTORATION OF HIS TOMB AT THE CHURCH OF ST NICHOLAS WITH ST MARY MAGDALENE IN THE PARISH OF CHISWICK AND THE HOLDING OF LECTURES, SEMINARS AND PLAYS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
PINI FRANCO LLP
22-24 ELY PLACE
LONDON
EC1N 6TE
- Phone:
- 02075663140
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window