BISHOP NYMPTON COMMUNITY LAND TRUST LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of Affordable Housing for local people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 11 January 2008: Standard registration
- 03 August 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2008 | 31/08/2009 | 31/08/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.96k | £270 | £705 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.65k | £250 | £451 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2010 | 27 December 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2009 | 21 March 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2008 | 08 March 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2008 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 SEPTEMBER 2007.
Charitable objects
1) PROVIDING HOUSES OR HOSTELS AND ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES FOR PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS; 2) PROVIDING FOR THE AGED, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED (WHETHER MENTALLY OR PHYSICALLY) OR CHRONICALLY SICK PERSONS IN NEED THEREOF HOUSES OR HOSTELS AND ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES SPECIALLY DESIGNED OR ADAPTED TO MEET THE DISABILITIES AND REQUIREMENTS OF SUCH PERSONS; 3) PROVIDING SERVICES, ADVICE OR ASSISTANCE UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS TO AGED, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED (WHETHER MENTALLY OR PHYSICALLY) OR CHRONICALLY SICK PERSONS IN NEED THEREOF; 4) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT; 5) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT AMONGST THE RESIDENTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT; 6) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND VOCATIONAL TRAINING AMONGST THE RESIDENTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND THE CREATION OF TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES BY THE PROVISION OF WORKSPACE, BUILDINGS AND/OR LAND FOR USE ON FAVOURABLE TERMS; 7) THE PROTECTION OR CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT INCLUDING THE CONSERVATION, RESTORATION AND RE-ESTABLISHMENT OF TREES IN PARTICULAR BROAD LEAFED TREES PLANTS AND ALL FORMS OF WILDLIFE AND THEREBY TO SECURE THE ENJOYMENT BY THE RESIDENTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT OF THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT; 8) THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC HEALTH FACILITIES AND CHILD CARE; 9) THE PROMOTION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTNERSHIP WITH THE POLICE AND OTHER BODIES AND AGENCIES, OF THE PROTECTION OF PEOPLE AND PROPERTY FROM AND THE PREVENTION OF CRIMINAL ACTS, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH ASSISTING IN MEASURES DESIGNED TO REDUCE THE LEVEL OF CRIME, ANTI-SOCIAL BEHAVIOUR, DRUG AND ALCOHOL DEPENDENCY AND VEHICLE SPEEDING AND TO PROVIDE EDUCATION INFORMATION AND PRACTICAL ASSISTANCE IN COMMUNITY SAFETY TO THE COMMUNITY. HOUSES AND HOSTELS SHALL HAVE THE MEANINGS GIVEN BY SECTION 106 OF THE HOUSING ASSOCIATIONS ACT 1985 AND SHALL INCLUDE BLOCKS OF FLATS WITHIN THE MEANING OF SECTION 4 OF THE HOUSING ASSOCIATIONS ACT 1985.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE DEVON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window