BOXTED AIRFIELD HISTORICAL GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A museum dedicated to the history of Boxted Airfield near Colchester Essex. This is open the last Sunday of every month from March to October inclusive plus National Heritage Weekend see our website for details www.boxted-airfield.com We fundraise by holding local events such as guest speakers. We also have a social calender for our 100 members which includes trips out, social evenings etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 12 March 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Phillip Wilders | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Richard Tomkins | Trustee | 16 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD TURNER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.87k | £16.86k | £4.73k | £9.55k | £7.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.58k | £3.94k | £9.10k | £9.94k | £12.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 18 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19TH FEBRUARY 2008
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY AND HERITAGE OF BOXTED AIRFIELD AND OF THE UNITS OF THE UNITED STATES ARMY AIR FORCE WHO WERE STATIONED THERE DURING WORLD WAR II, AND THE ROYAL AIR FORCE POST WORLD WAR II, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PRESERVATION AND DISPLAY, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, OF ARTEFACTS AND OTHER ITEMS PARTICULARLY RELATING TO THE PERIOD 1939 TO 1947 AND CONNECTED WITH UNITS OF THE UNITED STATES ARMY AIR FORCE AND THE ROYAL AIR FORCE STATIONED AT BOXTED AIRFIELD.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Oberon Close
COLCHESTER
CO4 3TD
- Phone:
- 01206865275
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window