CREATION FEST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organizing and presenting an annual 7 day outdoor festival plus a number of related promotional road shows leading up to the main festival featuring contemporary Christian musicians and public speakers for the purpose of attracting the general public with the view to ministering the Gospel of Jesus Christ and teaching on subjects relevant to Christian doctrine to all those who will hear.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Cornwall
- Devon
Governance
- 11 December 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brian Brodersen | Chair | 09 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
EMMA JOANNE FOWLE | Trustee | 02 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Colin Andrew McLean | Trustee | 09 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
SIMON LAWRENSON | Trustee | 06 December 2017 |
|
|||||
Martyn Molnar | Trustee | 07 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £432.11k | £76.52k | £271.47k | £445.50k | £354.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £445.32k | £93.73k | £223.18k | £421.49k | £422.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £5.40k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 30 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 30 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 22 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 22 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 25 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 25 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22 MAY 2006
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIANITY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE FOLLOWING: 1 TO WORSHIP GOD THE FATHER, SON AND HOLY SPIRIT; 2 TO BUILD UP THE CHURCH OF JESUS CHRIST, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE TEACHING AND PREACHING OF THE WORD OF GOD (THE BIBLE); 3 TO PROCLAIM THAT MEN AND WOMEN SHOULD REPENT AND BELIEVE IN JESUS CHRIST AS SAVIOUR AND LORD.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE NORTH DEVON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Creation Fest
The Goods Shed
Southern Way
WADEBRIDGE
Cornwall
PL27 7BX
- Phone:
- 08448794703
- Email:
- michelle@creationfest.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window