Financial history THE RATCLIFFE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1123152
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023
Total gross income £128.54k £79.79k £39.25k £74.50k £36.41k
Total expenditure £127.40k £87.01k £65.05k £65.82k £39.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A