Financial history THE ROWLAND SINGERS CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1122131
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £21.51k £4.41k £17.58k £21.32k £20.28k
Total expenditure £20.62k £4.23k £17.23k £17.39k £26.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A