SUPPORT TO RECOVERY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support to Recovery activities relieves the needs of persons within the county of West Yorkshire having mental health problems and those who care for people with mental health difficulties, by preventative means, through support, advice, visual arts, creativity, therapeutic interventions and physical activities and by any other charitable means that the trustees may from time to time think fit;
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £125,611 from 1 government contract(s) and £184,253 from 20 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Kirklees
Governance
- 07 January 2008: Standard registration
- S2R (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAULA WOOD | Chair | 09 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Laura Hunter | Trustee | 15 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Richard Clark | Trustee | 14 August 2023 |
|
|||||
Olivia Joy Ann Harriette | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martin James Sturdy | Trustee | 16 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Heather Douglas-Wilkinson | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maria Sarojini D'Cruz | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emily Kate Jackson | Trustee | 03 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
KEN SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £202.83k | £382.44k | £324.10k | £364.71k | £335.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £187.85k | £262.34k | £351.98k | £410.76k | £401.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £107.45k | £145.10k | £107.00k | £110.07k | £125.61k | |
|
Income from government grants | £46.15k | £207.26k | £178.19k | £197.22k | £184.25k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2020
(These accounts |
26 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 NOVEMBER 2007 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 29 SEP 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY WILL BE 1) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PERSONS WITHIN THE COUNTY OF WEST YORKSHIRE HAVING MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS AND THOSE WHO CARE FOR PEOPLE WITH MENTAL HEALTH DIFFICULTIES, BY PREVENTATIVE MEANS, THROUGH SUPPORT, ADVICE, VISUAL ARTS, CREATIVITY, THERAPEUTIC INTERVENTIONS AND PHYSICAL ACTIVITIES AND BY OTHER CHARITABLE MEANS THAT THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT 2) TO PROVIDE MENTAL HEALTH SERVICES, VOCATIONAL SERVICES, VISITS AND UNDERTAKE RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
WEST YORKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
5-7 Brook Street
HUDDERSFIELD
HD1 1EB
- Phone:
- 01484539531
- Email:
- contact@s2r.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window