THE VINE COMMUNITY CENTRE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide social space. Support community through activities and projects that meet the needs of local people, promoting trust, respect, empowerment and celebrate diversity, heritage and social integration. Family development through activities and groups to support children. We challenge inequality, and are there for people locally, across the city by bringing people together.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Nottingham City
Governance
- 18 February 2008: Standard registration
- THE VINE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev CLIVE BURROWS | Chair |
|
||||||
Dennis Palmer | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Geraldine Ransford-Kilpatrick | Trustee | 06 August 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £128.82k | £156.22k | £131.65k | £130.14k | £191.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £120.71k | £132.44k | £147.73k | £165.00k | £193.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £17.00k | £4.90k | £25.93k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 04 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 NOVEMBER 2007. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 12TH MARCH 2008.
Charitable objects
TO PURSUE ANY ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN HYSON GREEN AND FOREST FIELDS AND ELSEWHERE:- 1) TO EDUCATE FAMILIES AND THE PUBLIC IN BETTER STANDARDS OF CHILD CARE AND IN THE IMPORTANCE OF SOUND RELATIONS BETWEEN PARENTS AND CHILDREN FOR THE MAINTENANCE AND ENRICHMENT OF FAMILY LIFE. 2) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN. 3) TO RELIEVE CHILDREN WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS; 4) TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM THE DISABILITIES ATTENDANT UPON OLD AGE OR PHYSICAL HANDICAP; 5) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE COMMUNITY WHO THE VINE COMMUNITY CENTRE SERVES. 6) TO ENGAGE WITH OTHER ORGANISATION IN THE PROMOTION OF LOCAL ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT INITIATIVES. 7) TO PURSUE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE WHICH THE COMPANY THINKS FIT FOR PURSUIT IN CONJUNCTION WITH ANY OF THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES AFORESAID. FOOTNOTE: TO PROVIDE THESE SERVICES IN SUCH A WAY THAT THE CHRISTIAN ETHOS OF THE VIE COMMUNITY CENTRE IS MAINTAINED.
Area of benefit
NOTTINGHAM CITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE VINE COMMUNITY CENTRE
BOBBERS MILL ROAD
NOTTINGHAM
NG7 5GZ
- Phone:
- 01159249700
- Email:
- general@thevine.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window