JAMIA ISLAMIA (BIRMINGHAM) TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Teaching Secondary Education National Curriculum and Religous Studies
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Birmingham City
- Throughout England
Governance
- 03 June 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KIBRIA GHULAM | Trustee | 31 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED SHAMSUL ISLAM | Trustee | 31 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
FAROOK EKBAL AHMED | Trustee | 31 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
MR REQAUL HAQUE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR FAIZUL HAQUE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
INAMUL HAQUE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BADAR HAQUE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £216.93k | £214.27k | £279.60k | £229.27k | £209.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £167.30k | £178.43k | £208.74k | £215.66k | £236.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.21k | N/A | £28.15k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 21 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 21 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 20 June 2024 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 20 June 2024 | 81 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2 MAY 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 05 JAN 2022
Charitable objects
A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION C) TO DO ALL SUCH THING AS ARE INCIDENTAL OR CONDUCIVE TO THE ADVANCEMENT OF ALL CHARITABLE PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
JAMIA ISLAMIA BIRMINGHAM
ISLAMIC COLLEGE
FALLOWS ROAD
BIRMINGHAM
B11 1PL
- Phone:
- 07828485673
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window