Accounts and annual returns ALLIANCE OF FRIENDS OF KAFUE MISSION

Charity number: 1122640
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 04 July 2023 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 27 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 27 September 2021 89 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 27 September 2021 454 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required