Financial history MAGICAL MOMENTS PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1122943
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £236.33k £239.86k £222.20k £214.22k £242.32k
Total expenditure £207.61k £206.97k £257.71k £241.36k £248.17k
Income from government contracts N/A £171.21k £132.87k £123.05k N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A