Accounts and annual returns HARMONY MUSIC SCHOOL

Charity number: 1122722
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 October 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 29 October 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 29 October 2011 09 February 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 October 2011 Not Required
Annual return 29 October 2010 01 February 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 October 2010 Not Required
Annual return 29 October 2009 05 May 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 October 2009 Not Required