MADANIA WELFARE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
a) Providing, promoting and assisting in the provision of education and training including supplementary education in Bangladesh. b) The relief of financial need and suffering among victims of natural or other kinds of disaster in Bangladesh by such means as the trustees shall determine, for persons bodies organization affected.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bangladesh
Governance
- 27 March 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Syed Nazim Uddin | Trustee | 01 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
M Saleh Ahmed | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
MUHAMMED ALI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HUSSAIN AHMED | Trustee |
|
||||||
MOFIZ ALI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.89k | £75.45k | £129.17k | £107.76k | £103.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £100.74k | £41.99k | £53.25k | £213.92k | £21.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 22 June 2023 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 22 June 2023 | 22 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 08 September 2021 | 100 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 08 September 2021 | 100 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 12 June 2020 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 12 June 2020 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION (ADOPTED)3RD DECEMBER 2006 (AMENDED) 27 JANUARY 2008
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF BANGLADESHI PEOPLE RESIDENT IN THE UK OR BANGLADESH BY A)PROVIDING, PROMOTING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING INCLUDING SUPPLEMENTARY EDUCATION IN BANGLADESH B)THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED AND SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTER IN BANGLADESH BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE, FOR PERSONS BODIES ORGANISATIONS AFFECTED
Area of benefit
UK OR BANGLADESH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 4
71 Glasshouse Fields
London
E1W 3HG
- Phone:
- 07853307393
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window