BABA BALAK NATH MANDIR
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 20 May 2008: Standard registration
- 09 October 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2009 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 MARCH 2008
Charitable objects
1 TO ADVANCE THE TEACHINGS OF BABA BALAK NATHJI THAT THERE IS ONE GOD AND HE CAN BE WORSHIPPED IN ANY FORM, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE HINDU FAITH, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF BABA BALAK NATHJI. 2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF IMPOVERISHED CHILDREN IN INDIA. 3 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN INDIA BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL AND SUCH OTHER ASSISTANCE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE. 3 THE RELIEF
Area of benefit
INDIA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window