READING COMMUNITY LEARNING CENTRE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Reading Community Learning Centre offers classes, support and other opportunities for educationally disadvantaged and socially isolated women from Reading's diverse minority ethnic communities. Our emphasis is on finding ways into learning for even the most tentative and least confident of learners. RCLC also provides development opportunities for under-5s through an onsite creche.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £45,607 from 3 government contract(s)
People

18 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Reading
- West Berkshire
- Wokingham
Governance
- 29 February 2008: Standard registration
- 12 July 2023: Funds received from 1151346 HEALTHWATCH READING
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fatima Mohamed Habib | Chair | 03 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Shaheen Kausar | Trustee | 19 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Cecilia Garcia | Trustee | 16 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lillian Rose Magero | Trustee | 06 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Akua Ossei-Brainoo | Trustee | 04 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Soha Kamaran | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rengui Sally Jiang | Trustee | 16 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rajalakshmi Vengatesan | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Komal Komal | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Crystal Magotra | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simran Aul | Trustee | 24 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Clare Louise Furneaux | Trustee | 12 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rosie Chambers | Trustee | 23 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Theron | Trustee | 12 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Raya Mohamed Said | Trustee | 30 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
KAREN ROWLAND | Trustee | 12 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Lucy England | Trustee | 12 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
SARAH DEL TUFO | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £180.87k | £199.88k | £152.52k | £150.95k | £197.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £156.88k | £143.10k | £175.14k | £208.08k | £225.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £30.63k | £48.00k | £48.75k | £40.00k | £45.61k | |
|
Income from government grants | £38.34k | £38.26k | £11.47k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 DECEMBER 2007, AS AMENDED 19 FEBRUARY 2008
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE READING: 1) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE NEEDS OF THOSE WHO ARE SOCIALLY OR ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED, IN PARTICULAR WOMEN AND CHILDREN AND THOSE FROM MINORITY ETHNIC COMMUNITIES, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) PROVIDING GENERAL EDUCATION AND TRAINING, INCLUDING LANGUAGE SKILLS AND OTHER BASIC SKILLS, TO ADVANCE THEM IN LIFE AND/OR ASSIST THEM TO ADAPT WITHIN A NEW COMMUNITY; AND B) PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECTS OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND RELIEVING THE EFFECTS OF ISOLATION. 2) TO PROMOTE RACIAL AND RELIGIOUS HARMONY AND RAISE AWARENESS ABOUT, AND TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN, PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL AND RELIGIOUS GROUPS. 3) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ABOUT ISSUES RELATING TO MIGRANTS, THOSE SEEKING ASYLUM AND/OR GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS TO HELP PROMOTE KNOWLEDGE, MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING AND MUTUAL AND GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN THEM. 4) TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG PEOPLE LIVING OR WORKING IN THE READING AREA BY PROVIDING INFORMATION, ADVICE AND SUPPORT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, READING, WOKINGHAM AND WEST BERKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
94 London Street
READING
RG1 4SJ
- Phone:
- 01189599009
- Email:
- aishamalik@rclc.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window