Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF BANGLADESH CYCLONE DISASTER APPEAL

Charity number: 1121967
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2011 14 February 2012 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2010 09 December 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2009 24 February 2010 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted