MYROVLYTIS TRUST

Charity number: 1122073
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Promote research into rare disorders and advance education of the public in medical and molecular genetics.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Argentina
  • Australia
  • Austria
  • Bangladesh
  • Belgium
  • Bolivia
  • Brazil
  • Canada
  • China
  • Croatia
  • Denmark
  • Finland
  • France
  • Germany
  • Greece
  • Hong Kong
  • Iceland
  • India
  • Indonesia
  • Ireland
  • Italy
  • Japan
  • Malaysia
  • Netherlands
  • New Zealand
  • Northern Ireland
  • Norway
  • Pakistan
  • Poland
  • Portugal
  • Scotland
  • Spain
  • Sweden
  • Switzerland
  • United States

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 September 2011: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • MYROVLYTIS TRUST LIMITED (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Grace Okoro Trustee 24 October 2024
None on record
Amit Bhagwat Trustee 24 October 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 31/03/2024
Total gross income £68.26k £323.14k £159.04k £342.31k £594.13k
Total expenditure £65.04k £347.64k £145.33k £331.88k £899.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £590.21k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £3.63k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £288
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £899.81k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £525.61k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 31/03/2024
Own use assets N/A N/A N/A N/A £4.86k
Long-term investments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Other assets N/A N/A N/A N/A £12.16k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Total liabilities N/A N/A N/A N/A £314.02k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 04 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 04 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 23 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 23 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 17 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 17 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 09 August 2021 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 09 August 2021 10 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 24 November 2020 117 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 24 November 2020 117 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 30/08/2011
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST ("THE OBJECTS") ARE (A)THE ADVANCEMENT AND PROMOTION OF RESEARCH INTO MEDICAL AND MOLECULAR GENETICS IN ORDER TO BETTER UNDERSTAND, DIAGNOSE, PREVENT, CURE AND RELIEVE CONDITIONS CAUSED BY GENETIC DISORDERS AND/OR DISORDERS INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO BIRT-HOGG-DUBE SYNDROME AND THE FREE DISSEMINATION OF THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH TO THE PUBLIC; (B)THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN MEDICAL AND MOLECULAR GENETICS; AND (C)TO ASSIST IN THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, TREATMENT AND CARE OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MEDICAL AND MOLECULAR GENETIC DISORDERS, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO BIRT-HOGG-DUBE SYNDROME, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, GOODS AND SERVICES.
Area of benefit
Registration history
  • 20 September 2011 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
26 Cadogan Square
LONDON
SW1X 0JP
Phone:
020 8050 2091