LOCWS INTERNATIONAL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's principal objectives are to promote the arts for the benefit of the public and to advance education in the arts by making the arts more accessible and responsive to cultural heritage. To meet these objectives the charity delivers a variety of arts and learning programmes that enable people to take part in the arts in a meaningful way, learn new skills and broaden their aspirations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- City Of Swansea
- Neath Port Talbot
Governance
- 22 April 2008: Standard registration
- 16 April 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2015 | 05/04/2016 | 05/04/2017 | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £107.79k | £80.47k | £47.58k | £45.45k | £6.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £162.07k | £73.78k | £49.56k | £44.34k | £12.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £15.30k | £15.80k | £0 | £32.84k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2019 | 03 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2018 | 14 December 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2018 | 14 December 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2017 | 28 December 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2017 | 28 December 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 DECEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ART FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN ART BY MAKING ART MORE ACCESSIBLE TO THE PUBLIC AND RESPONSIVE TO CULTURAL HERITAGE.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window