THE THORNTON AND ALLERTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Thornton & Allerton Community Association manage South Square Centre, a series of Grade II listed workers cottages. The charity runs and a range of arts, community, heritage and wellbeing activities. Rents from small emerging businesses and artists' studios and a team of volunteers underpin the organisation. Wet also apply for grants to run outreach programmes, internships and community events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £30,738 from 4 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
135 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bradford City
Governance
- 28 December 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew Storey | Chair | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Aamta-Tul Waheed | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Murray | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Whitby | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Emily Hiley | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sonam Khan | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Molly Jewitt | Trustee | 05 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
MAZHAR ELLAHI | Trustee | 27 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Dominic Sheard | Trustee | 14 May 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £171.24k | £633.99k | £398.79k | £170.78k | £139.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £185.82k | £491.12k | £466.58k | £466.58k | £189.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £21.63k | £69.39k | £26.57k | £36.64k | £30.74k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £613.97k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £20.02k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £489.43k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £1.68k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £840 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 03 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 AUGUST 2007
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THORNTON AND ALLERTON AND NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY IN PARTICULAR BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
THORNTON AND ALLERTON, BRADFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
THORNTON & ALLERTON COMMUNITY ASSOC
SOUTH SQUARE
THORNTON
BRADFORD
BD13 3LD
- Phone:
- 01274834747
- Email:
- info@southsquarecentre.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window