Financial history ELLERT FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1122169
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £4.96k £2.92k £13 £139 £1.13k
Total expenditure £33.85k £56.11k £40.81k £28.99k £52.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A