ANGLO IRANIAN SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A wide variety of Cultural and language activities, providing sevices such as , job search , educational courses , emotional support , human /woman right advise , youth activities for Bristol persian and British community ,
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bournemouth
- Bristol City
- City Of Swansea
- Gloucestershire
- North Somerset
- Portsmouth City
- Somerset
- Sutton
- Swindon
Governance
- 16 September 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Homes England
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AZIZOLLAH BAYAT | Chair | 20 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
ABOLGHASSEM GOLESTANI | Trustee | 11 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMAD TAVASSOLI | Trustee | 11 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 August 2024 | 187 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 April 2021 | 73 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 AUGUST 2008
Charitable objects
ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF IRANIAN/PERSIAN CULTURE, TRADITION, LANGUAGE, HISTORY, MUSIC AND THE ARTS. PROMOTE RACIAL HARMONY BETWEEN BRITISH AND IRANIAN PEOPLE BY PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS AND ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN ORDER TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS. RELIEVE FINANCIAL NEED AND SUFFERING AMONG IRANIAN IMMIGRANTS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND SUPPORT. RELIEVE UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT, INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED, IN PRACTICE LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
86-88 WEST STREET
OLD MARKET
BRISTOL
BS2 0BW
- Phone:
- 01179087766
- Email:
- aisbristol@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window