WIPE AWAY THOSE TEARS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We work with disabled, special needs & terminally ill children throughout the Essex area. Providing help that they cannot get elsewhere.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 07 February 2008: Standard registration
- 11 September 2024: Funds received from 1042779 THE WESTFIELD PRE-SCHOOL
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JASON O'SHEA | Chair |
|
||||||
GAIL O'SHEA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £233.44k | £77.28k | £106.44k | £76.57k | £129.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £188.55k | £126.48k | £101.29k | £102.13k | £126.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 FEBRUARY 2008
Charitable objects
1 THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WHO ARE SICK, DISABLED OR HAVE SPECIAL NEEDS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT, HOLIDAYS AND OTHER FACILITIES AND SERVICES TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. 2 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS ATTENDING SCHOOLS IN ROMFORD, ESSEX AND ITS SURROUNDING AREA BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES NOT REQUIRED TO BE PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOLS.
Area of benefit
ROMFORD, ESSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wipe Away Those Tears
Unit H
The Business Centre
Faringdon Avenue
ROMFORD
RM3 8EN
- Phone:
- 01708330600
- Email:
- gail@wipeawaythosetears.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window