TS WARRIOR CADET

Charity number: 1122754
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

HIKING SWIMMING ORIENTEERING CANOEING ABSEILING FIRST AID CAMPING ROPE WORK POWER BOATING BAND PARADE COMBAT SKILLS RIFLE SHOOTING CAMOUFLAGE RAFTING IT & COMMS CEREMONIAL DRILL.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £8,084
Total expenditure: £10,827

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 February 2008: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • TS WARRIOR NAVAL CADET CORPS (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Arthur Scriven Trustee 23 December 2015
None on record
DUNCAN BOYNE Trustee
None on record
FRANK DEREK CHARLES ESHERWOOD Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.99k £3.29k £8.73k £6.32k £8.08k
Total expenditure £16.16k £7.99k £9.88k £3.14k £10.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 29 March 2025 57 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 27 March 2025 421 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 March 2023 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
3 ST. HILDAS CRESCENT
GORLESTON
GREAT YARMOUTH
NR31 7QR
Phone:
01493444510
Website:

No information available