REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD (RCCG) STILLWATERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity are the advancement of the Christian Faith worldwide and the relief of poverty.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 15 January 2008: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR OLUDARE DEMUREN MBBS | Chair | 26 April 2013 |
|
|||||
DR ADENIYI FABOYA MBBS | Trustee | 26 April 2013 |
|
|||||
Dr ABIODUN OLAYINKA OBISESAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PASTOR AKINTAYO AKINSOOTO OJO | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 July 2024 | 254 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 November 2020 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 2 DECEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIAN FAITH WORLDWIDE AND 2 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Heath House
Heath Business Park
Grange Way
COLCHESTER
CO2 8GU
- Phone:
- 01206795778
- Email:
- info@rccgstillwaters.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window