Financial history DARRAN LAS COMMUNITY BUILDING

Charity number: 1123696
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.71k £26.14k £7.73k £27.97k £57.61k
Total expenditure £9.48k £5.53k £10.20k £27.60k £42.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £24.00k N/A £23.36k £53.10k