ST SIDWELL'S CENTRE, EXETER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community centre promoting local community participation and involvement, health & well-being & social inclusion. Meeting room hire. IT & communal internet access. Volunteer led Community Cafe with an emphasis on affordable healthy eating. Community Garden promoting environmental & sustainability issues. Provide and facilitate a wide range of high quality volunteering and student placement.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £67,035 from 2 government contract(s) and £94,181 from 16 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Devon
Governance
- 08 February 2008: Standard registration
- ST SIDWELL'S CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Celia Plender | Chair | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Hurry | Trustee | 06 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH MICHAELSON | Trustee | 17 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Knox | Trustee | 17 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen James Henry | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chris Dickens | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Keith Gordon Bell | Trustee | 13 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARCUS GARDNER | Trustee | 01 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr SUAAD GENEM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £256.83k | £389.29k | £358.95k | £383.83k | £370.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £280.32k | £306.01k | £316.03k | £359.72k | £395.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £72.50k | £38.71k | £84.06k | £107.66k | £67.04k | |
|
Income from government grants | £8.50k | £105.36k | £110.81k | £65.71k | £94.18k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22 NOVEMBER 2007 AS AMENDED 1 FEBRUARY 2008 as amended on 20 Aug 2020 as amended on 03 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF EXETER AND THE SURROUNDING AREA WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS WITH THE OBJECTS OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS; AND 2) TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE CENTRE') AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
EXETER
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sidwell Street
Exeter
Devon
EX4 6NN
- Phone:
- 01392666222
- Email:
- admin@stsidwells.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window