Accounts and annual returns AGE RELATED DISEASES AND HEALTH TRUST LTD
Charity number: 1124019

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 04 December 2024 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 22 March 2024 | 174 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 22 March 2024 | 174 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 18 December 2022 | 79 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 10 December 2021 | 71 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window